EP1298913 - System and method of authenticating a digitally captured image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fredlund, John Randall, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Parker, Martin Alan, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/14] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078855.0 | 18.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | US20010966678 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 966678 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298913 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298913 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3235 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3236 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3278 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/03] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Beglaubigen digital erfasster Bilder | [2003/14] | English: | System and method of authenticating a digitally captured image | [2003/14] | French: | Système et mèthode de authentification d'images saisies numériquement | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5499294 (FRIEDMAN GARY L [US]) [X] 2,8* column 6 *; | [A]WO0049797 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NA [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 17 - page 7, line 5 *; | [X] - KELSEY J ET AL, "An authenticated camera", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1996., 12TH ANNUAL SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 9-13 DEC. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19961209), ISBN 0-8186-7606-X, pages 24 - 30, XP010213038 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSAC.1996.569666 | [X] - FRIEDMAN G L, "THE TRUSTWORTHY DIGITAL CAMERA: RESTORING CREDIBILITY TO THE PHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19931101), vol. 39, no. 4, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 905 - 910, XP000423080 [X] 2,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.267415 | [A] - MORITO H ET AL, "Digital camera for taking evidential photographic images", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS. 2001 DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. ICCE. LOS ANGELES, CA, JUNE 19 - 21, 2001, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010619), ISBN 0-7803-6622-0, pages 118 - 119, XP010552093 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE.2001.935236 | Examination | - BRUCE SCHNEIER, Applied Cryptography Secon Edition: protocols, algorithms, and source code in C, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), XP002155112 |