EP1321051 - Garment with cupwires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utax Co., Ltd. 355, Yokoo, Hojocho Kasai-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2008/41] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Utax Co., Ltd. 355, Yokoo, Hojocho Kasai-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utaka, Shohei 98, Kurita, Hojocho Kasai-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 02079263.6 | 15.10.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | JP20010389909 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001389909 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321051 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321051 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1321051 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A41C3/00, A41C3/12 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
A41C3/124 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | A41C3/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bekleidung mit Versteifungsbügeln für Körbchen | [2003/26] | English: | Garment with cupwires | [2003/26] | French: | Vêtement à armatures de bonnets | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 30.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001316905 ; | [XA]US3608556 (PATERSON STEPHEN) [X] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-11 *[A] 3; | [X]US6056624 (FILDAN GERHARD [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6; figures 20-23; claims 26-28 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001316905 A 20011116 (WACOAL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |