EP1310456 - Process for the production of potassium octoborate tetrahydrate and its use in the agronomic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/20] | Process for the production of a boron salt and its use in the agronomic field | ||
[2005/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societa' Chimica Larderello S.p.A. Via G. Fara 28 20124 Milano / IT | [2006/41] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Societa' Chimica Larderello S.p.A. Piazza Leopolda 2 56044 Larderello, Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miele, Sergio, c/o Società Chimica Larderello SpA Piazza Leopolda 2 56044 Larderello (Pisa) / IT | 02 /
Bargiacchi, Enrica, c/o Società Chimica Larderello Piazza Leopolda 2 56044 Larderello (Pisa) / IT | 03 /
Giorgis, Giuseppe, c/o Società Chimica Larderello Piazza Leopolda 2 56044 Larderello (Pisa) / IT | 04 /
Bonini, Paolo, c/o Società Chimica Larderello SpA Piazza Leopolda 2 56044 Larderello (Pisa) / IT | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Coppo, Alessandro Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Boronuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Coppo, Alessandro Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02079331.1 | 18.10.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02269 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012269 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310456 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310456 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310456 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/12, C05D11/00, C05G3/00, C05D1/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C05D9/02 (EP,US);
C01B35/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/20] | C01B35/12, C05D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | LT | 26.05.2004 | LV | 26.05.2004 | RO | 26.05.2004 | SI | 26.05.2004 | Title | German: | Prozess für die Herstellung von Kaliumoctoborat-Tetrahydrat und seine Anwendung in der Landwirtschaft | [2005/24] | English: | Process for the production of potassium octoborate tetrahydrate and its use in the agronomic field | [2005/24] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de l'octoborate de potassium tétrahydrate et son utilisation dans le domaine agronomique | [2005/24] |
Former [2003/20] | Prozess für die Herstellung von Borsalz und seine Anwendung in der Landwirtschaft | ||
Former [2003/20] | Process for the production of a boron salt and its use in the agronomic field | ||
Former [2003/20] | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un sel borique et son utilisation dans le domaine agronomique | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | BE | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | IE | 18.10.2006 | LU | 18.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
LU | 18.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]SU1608116 ; | [X]US4089790 (ADAMS JOHN HOWARD) [X] 1 * example 2 *; | [X]WO9909832 (BASF CORP [US]) [X] 1,14-17 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 20 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 2 *; | [X]EP0937557 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0052] *; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 31, Database accession no. 1991-228774, XP002258608 & SU1608116 A 19901123 (DEINEDENKO V R) [X] 2-4 * abstract * [A] 5-13 |