EP1310893 - Information storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aasman, Jannes Fagelstraat 7 2334 AV Leiden / NL | 02 /
Kardol, Johannes Jan Dirk Costerplein 278 2624 VC Delft / NL | 03 /
Kalberg, Robertus Johannes Nicolaas Azaleapark 53 2724 JB Zoetermeer / NL | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. BOX 95321 2509 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 02079615.7 | 04.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | NL20011019286 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: NL 1019286 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1310893 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Informationsspeichersystem | [2003/20] | English: | Information storage system | [2003/20] | French: | Système de stockage d'informations | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2011 | 09.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/47] | 18.07.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5708828 (COLEMAN J TODD [US]) [X] 1-10,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - column 5, line 31 *; | [A]EP0821507 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** page 1, column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 21 *; | [XY]EP1030254 (SD & M [DE]) [X] 1-10,13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [Y] 11,12; | [Y]WO0150702 (AVALON [FR], et al) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | WO9803928 | WO9955050 | EP1030254 |