EP1296470 - Optical transmission systems using optical amplifiers and wavelength division multiplexing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Kim Byron 10 Mission Inn Grove Nepean, Ontario K2R 1C6 / CA | 02 /
May, Gregory Dean 1067 Pinewood Cres. Ottawa, Ontario K2B 5Y3 / CA | 03 /
O'Sullivan, Maurice Stephen 84 Harmer Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 0T9 / CA | [2003/35] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
Roberts, Kim Byron 41 Sherrardspark Road, Welwyn Garden City Herts AL8 7LD / GB | ||
02 /
May, Gregory Dean 907-130 Somerset St. West Ottawa, Ontario K2P 0H9 / CA | |||
03 /
O'Sullivan, Maurice Stephen 84 Harmer Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 0T9 / CA | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02080042.1 | 04.12.1996 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | US19960669929 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: US 669929 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1296470 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1296470 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296470 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/24, H04B10/17 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H04J14/0291 (EP,US);
H04B10/032 (EP,US);
H04B10/2589 (EP,US);
H04B10/2972 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US);
H04J14/0241 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | H04B10/17, H04J14/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/13] | Title | German: | Optisches Übertragungssystemen unter Verwendung von optischen Verstärkern und Wellenlängen Multiplex | [2003/13] | English: | Optical transmission systems using optical amplifiers and wavelength division multiplexing | [2003/13] | French: | Systèmes de transmission optique utilisant des amplificateurs optiques et le multiplexage en longueurs d'ondes | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96939787.6 / EP0908034 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0445364 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * see abstract * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, line 20 - line 31 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 27 * * claims 1,3,7,8 *; | [A]EP0617527 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 1 - line 33 * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 3 *; | [A] - HILL G R ET AL, "WAVELENGTH ROUTING FOR LONG HAUL NETWORKS", WORLD PROSPERITY THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS, BOSTON, JUNE 11 - 14, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890611), vol. 2 OF 3, pages 734 - 738, XP000075239 [A] 1-12 * page 735, column 2, line 35 - page 736, column 1, line 5 * |