EP1321247 - Portable container for an electric tool with dust suction and collection capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valentini, Guido Via Corridoni, 4 20122 Milano / IT | [2007/31] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Valentini, Guido Via Gioberti, 2 20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/10] | Gatti, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l. Via Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/26] | Mittler, Enrico c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02080074.4 | 06.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI00676U | 21.12.2001 Original published format: IT MI20010676 U | IT2002MI00293U | 05.06.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020293 U | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321247 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321247 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1321247 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, A47L9/00, B25H3/00, B24B55/10 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A47L9/0018 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0057 (EP,US);
B24B55/10 (EP,US);
B25H3/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | B25H3/02, B23Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Behälter für ein elektrisches Handwerkzeug mit Fähigkeit zum Absaugen und Sammeln von Staub | [2003/26] | English: | Portable container for an electric tool with dust suction and collection capacity | [2003/26] | French: | Récipient portatif pour un outil à main électrique avec capacité d'aspiration et collection de poussière | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 20.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | IE | 06.12.2007 | LU | 06.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | GB | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 06.12.2007 | ||
LU | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
GB | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
GB | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
GB | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10337680 ; | [A]US3328826 (AMOS PAUL E) [A] 1 * column 3, line 9 - line 29 * * figure 6 *; | [A]JPS61193623 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 7 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]EP0281129 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,8 * column 5, line 11 - line 18 * * column 6, line 27 - line 29 * * figures 1-3,9,12,18 *; | [A]EP0371236 (FESTO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 27 * * column 7, line 8 - line 22 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP0377100 (FEIN C & E) [A] 1 * column 5, line 24 - line 43 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5095579 (BECKER BRIAN E [US]) [X] 1,3-8 * column 5, line 49 - column 10, line 10 * * figures 1-19 * [Y] 2; | [A]GB2324713 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 6,7 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 15 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]GB2330521 (SPOONER PAUL [GB]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0916302 (FESTO TOOLTECHNIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 19 - line 39 * * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 32 * * figure - *; | [PA]DE10063022 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1-5,8* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10337680 A 19981222 (GONNOKI SEIJI) [A] 6,7 * abstract * |