EP1326096 - Photoresist nanocomposite optical plastic article and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Border, John, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
McGovern, Michael R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
McLaughlin, Paul O., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02080184.1 | 09.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | US20010027378 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 27378 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326096 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04, G02B7/00 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
G02B7/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Photolack-Nanoverbundplastikartikel und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2003/28] | English: | Photoresist nanocomposite optical plastic article and method of making same | [2003/28] | French: | Objet optique en plastique nanocomposite de photorésine et procédé pour son fabrication | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5470910 (SPANHEL LUBOMIR [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 29 * * column 4, line 9 - line 41 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 48 *; | [XY]US5783115 (BILKADI ZAYN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 49 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 31 *[Y] 1,2,4,5,7-9; | [X]US6228904 (YADAV TAPESH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 11 *; | [XY]EP1099963 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 34 - page 5, paragraph 38 * [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-9; | [E]EP1217393 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [E] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 23 - page 5, paragraph 25 * * page 7, paragraph 38 * * claims 1,2,6-9 * |