EP1243286 - Intravascular electrode lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolberg, Gernot Karl-Marx-Strasse 37 12043 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Schaldach, Max verstorben / DE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02090116.1 | 19.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE20011014725 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114725 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243286 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243286 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A61N1/057 (EP,US);
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Intravaskuläre Elektrodenleitung | [2002/39] | English: | Intravascular electrode lead | [2002/39] | French: | Fil d'électrode intravasculaire | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2013 | 21.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | FR | 05.05.2014 | GB | 05.06.2014 | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/18] | IT | 05.03.2014 | |
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | NL | 05.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4414986 (DICKHUDT EUGENE A [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, lines 4-12 * * column 3, lines 37-49; figure 2 *; | [A]US5170802 (MEHRA RAHUL [US]) [A] 1,2,10* column 3, lines 18-54; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6033397 (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 26-48 * * column 14, lines 3-14; figure 11 *; | [AD]US6129750 (TOCKMAN BRUCE A [US], et al) [AD] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-7 * | Examination | EP1129745 |