EP1249850 - Insulating housing, in particular for vacuumswitch, with a support for positioning a control electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mascher, Karl Am Dachsbau 102 A 13503 Berlin / DE | [2002/42] | Application number, filing date | 02090131.0 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | DE2001118960 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118960 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249850 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249850 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249850 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/24, H01H33/66 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H01H33/662 (EP);
H01H33/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | H01H33/66, H01H33/24 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/03] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Isoliergehäuse, insbesondere Gehäuse einer Schaltröhre eines Vakuumschalters, mit einer Halterung zur Positionierung einer Steuerelektrode | [2002/42] | English: | Insulating housing, in particular for vacuumswitch, with a support for positioning a control electrode | [2002/42] | French: | Boîtier isolant, en particulier pour interrupteur à vide, avec un support pour le positionnement d'une électrode de commande | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 29.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 12.12.2007 | [2009/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0411492 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2719414 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [DA]DE29717489U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |