EP1288098 - Wheel sensor and arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/10] | Wheel sensor | ||
[2008/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Harald Max-Plank-Str. 32 38104 Braunschweig / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 02090264.9 | 17.07.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001137519 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10137519 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288098 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288098 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B61L1/16 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
B61L1/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Radsensor und Anordnung | [2008/28] | English: | Wheel sensor and arrangement | [2008/28] | French: | Détecteur de roue et arrangement | [2008/28] |
Former [2003/10] | Radsensor | ||
Former [2003/10] | Wheel sensor | ||
Former [2003/10] | Détecteur de roue | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | LU | 17.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 17.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3882374 (MCDANIEL ALDEN W) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DD261004 (DEUTSCHE REICHSBAHN [DD]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19709844 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE19915597 (FRAUSCHER JOSEF [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * |