EP1291037 - Rate adaptive pacemaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2006/19] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mlynski, Michael Frank Am Bollet 57 52078 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Diem, Björn Henrik Aureliusstrasse 42 52064 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Ameling, Walter Morillenhang 67 52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Hanrath, Peter Gut Steeg 16 52074 Aachen / DE | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02090320.9 | 05.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | DE20011044442 | 06.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144442 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291037 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291037 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1291037 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368, A61N1/362, A61N1/365, A61B5/0432, A61B5/0468, A61N1/37 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
A61N1/36585 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | A61N1/368 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Ratenadaptiver Herzschrittmacher | [2003/11] | English: | Rate adaptive pacemaker | [2003/11] | French: | Stimulateur cardiaque à fréquence asservie | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | AT | 05.09.2006 | LU | 05.09.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.09.2006 | ||
LU | 05.09.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.09.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0448193 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 1 - column 45, line 26; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US5144949 (OLSON WALTER H [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 3 - column 12, line 42; figures 1,6 *; | [X]US5292340 (CROSBY PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-6* column 3 - column 20; figures 2,4,6,9,10 *; | [X]US5514164 (MANN BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 49 - column 22, line 2; figures 2-5 *; | [X]US5792192 (LU RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 27 - column 10, line 14; figures 1-4,8 *; | [X]WO0105465 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 6, line 12 - page 23, line 15; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | EP0449401 | DE19747820 | DE19940952 |