EP1400471 - Method for opening bobbins and device for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dombek, Manfred Meyersweg 24 21521 Dassendorf / DE | 02 /
Janz, Dietmar Wiesenweg 44 22946 Trittau / DE | 03 /
Hebels, Albert-Berend Zollenspieker Hauptdeich 130 21037 Hamburg / DE | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
Dombek, Manfred Meyersweg 24 21521 Dassendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Janz, Dietman Wiesenweg 44 22946 Trittau / DE | |||
03 /
Hebels, Albert-Berend Zollenspieker Hauptdeich 130 21037 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02090336.5 | 17.09.2002 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400471 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/10 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
B65H19/105 (EP);
B65H2301/46064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Öffnen von Bobinen sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2004/13] | English: | Method for opening bobbins and device for performing the method | [2004/13] | French: | Procédé pour ouvrir des bobines et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4683022 (WATANABE TAKEMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 8, line 18 - line 44; figure 8A *; | [X]EP0545267 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 7,9-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4212095 (MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG) [A] 1,7* the whole document *; | [A]US6227088 (CESTONARO JEAN [CH], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 42 - line 47 * * column 2, line 20 - line 48 * * column 4, line 10 - line 16; figure - * |