EP1262336 - A three piece tire assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rayman, William Earl 11271 Wilhurst Avenue NE OH 44632, Hartville / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2002/49] | Leitz, Paul, et al Goodyear S.A., Patent-Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02100548.3 | 22.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | US20010871025 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 871025 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262336 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262336 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/02, B62D49/06, B62D55/24 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B62D49/0635 (EP,US);
B60C11/02 (EP,US);
B60C11/22 (EP,US);
B62D55/244 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/15] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ein dreiteiliger Reifenzusammenbau | [2002/49] | English: | A three piece tire assembly | [2002/49] | French: | Un assemblage de pneumatiques en trois pièces | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/25] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1422113 (WILLIAM MCEWEN) [Y] 3,6 * page 1, line 71 - line 85 ** figures 1,5 *; | [Y]FR921901 (MALETTE JEAN-REMY-GUSTAVE) [Y] 8 * page 2 * * figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US3105536 (GIULIO CAPPA) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * column 4, line 25 - line 41 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 3,6,8 | by applicant | US4351380 |