EP1270908 - Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGA, Junichi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi,Fuchu-cho HIROSHIMA / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA, Kazuya c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi,Fuchu-cho HIROSHIMA / JP | 03 /
KUJI, Youichi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi,Fuchu-cho HIROSHIMA / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02100672.1 | 06.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010172168 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001172168 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270908 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270908 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
F02D41/3076 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N2570/04 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0818 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/03] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abgasreinigung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2003/01] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for internal combustion engine | [2003/01] | French: | Dispositif de purification de gaz d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001055919 ; | [A]JPH11141330 ; | [A]JP2001152837 ; | [X]DE19851564 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,12 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, lines 44-48 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001055919 A 20010227 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-5,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11141330 A 19990525 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 3-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001152837 A 20010605 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * |