EP1276218 - Electric circuit device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
CZ
EE
BG
SK
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/03] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
CZ
EE
BG
SK
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tolle, Tobias c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W Weisshausstrasse 2, 52066, Aachen / DE | 02 /
Duerbaum, Thomas c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W Weisshausstrasse 2, 52066, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Smidt, Pieter Jan Mark c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W Weishausstrasse 2, 52066, Aachen / DE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02100797.6 | 10.07.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | DE2001133865 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133865 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276218 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1276218 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337, H02M7/217 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H02M7/06 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US);
H02M7/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | H02M3/337 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltungsanordnung | [2003/03] | English: | Electric circuit device | [2003/03] | French: | Dispositif circuit électrique | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001037226 ; | [DY]EP0229950 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [DY] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4947308 (GULCZYNSKI ZDZISLAW [US]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [DA]DE4037722 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INFORMATIONSSYSTEME) [DA] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0940907 (ELECTROWATT TECH INNOVAT CORP [CH]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - line 47 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19841972 (SICAN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 29 - line 36 ** figures 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001037226 A 20010209 (CHIYODA) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |