EP1291391 - Bitumen aggregate and method for producing road structural layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tieliikelaitos Opastinsilta 12 B 00520 Helsinki / FI | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laitinen, Esko Koivuniemenkuja 5 90830, Haukipudas / FI | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
Laitinen, Esko Tieliikelaitos Opastinsilta 12 B 00520, Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02102213.2 | 23.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | FI20010001776 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: FI 20011776 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291391 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1291391 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08K11/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
E01C7/26 (EP);
C04B28/08 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
C08L95/005 (EP);
E01C7/182 (EP);
C04B2111/0075 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/08, C04B7/00, C04B24/36, C04B2103/408 (EP);
C08L95/005, C08L2666/54 (EP);
C08L95/005, C08L2666/72 (EP);
C08L95/005, C08L2666/74 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/54 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/72 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | LT | 18.08.2003 | LV | 18.08.2003 | Title | German: | Bitumenaggregat und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer strukturierten Strassenbelagsschicht | [2003/11] | English: | Bitumen aggregate and method for producing road structural layer | [2003/11] | French: | Aggregat bitumineux et procédé de construction d'une couche structurelle de revêtement routier | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | BE | 29.11.2006 | CH | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | IT | 29.11.2006 | LI | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | BG | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | ES | 12.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | IE | 23.08.2007 | LU | 23.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CY | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
IE | 23.08.2007 | ||
LU | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
IE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | BG | 28.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0648803 ; | [X]JPS5674146 ; | [X]FR2517686 (ZALAEGERSZEGI KOZUTIEPITO VALL [HU]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2661173 (COLAS SA [FR]) [X] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]EP0545740 (BEUGNET SA [FR]) [X] 1-19 * page 3, lines 3-18 * * claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 12, Database accession no. 1994-097659, XP002219220 & JPH0648803 A 19940222 (CHUGAI SHOKO KK) [X] 1-19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 32, Database accession no. 1981-57642D, XP002219221 & JPS5674146 A 19810619 (OSAKA CEMENT KK) [X] 1-19 * the whole document * |