EP1306637 - Subassembly for a cooler package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frana-Guthrie, Rebecca, Ann 7113 106th Avenue 61240, Coal Valley / US | 02 /
Sheidler, Alan, David 3528 56th Street Court 61265, Moline / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Holst, Sönke, Dr., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02102474.0 | 23.10.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | US20010053514P | 25.10.2001 Original published format: US 53514 P | [2003/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306637 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, F28D7/00 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
F28F9/002 (EP);
F28D1/0443 (EP);
F28D2021/0082 (EP);
F28D2021/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK [2004/04] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Unterzusammenbau für ein Kühlerpaket | [2003/18] | English: | Subassembly for a cooler package | [2003/18] | French: | Sous-assemblage pour un ensemble de refroidisseurs | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 10.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4736727 (WILLIAMS J LARRY [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]US4916902 (PRATT HOWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]DE4244039 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10018001 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | US6298906 |