EP1308997 - Charge detector semiconductor device, system consisting of a charge detector semiconductor device and a reference semiconductor device, wafer, use of a wafer and method of the qualitative measurement of the charge up of a wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/19] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Hans-Ulrich c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH P 52088, Aachen / DE | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/07] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/01] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2003/19] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02102534.1 | 05.11.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE2001154392 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154392 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308997 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308997 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H01L22/34 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | Ladungsdetektor-Halbleiterbauelement, System aus einem Ladungsdetektor-Halbleiterbauelement und einem Referenz-Halbleiterbauelement, Wafer, Verwendung eines Wafers und Verfahren zur qualitativen Messung einer Aufladung eines Wafers | [2003/19] | English: | Charge detector semiconductor device, system consisting of a charge detector semiconductor device and a reference semiconductor device, wafer, use of a wafer and method of the qualitative measurement of the charge up of a wafer | [2003/19] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur pour detecter des charges, système se composant d'un dispositif semi-conducteur pour détecter des charges, un dispositif semi-conducteur de référence, tranche, utlisation d'une tranche et méthode pour mesurer qualitativement le charge d'une tranche | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10284726 ; | [A]US5594328 (LUKASZEK WIESLAW A [US]); | [A]EP0874395 (LAM RES CORP [US]); | [A]US2001028056 (YAMAMOTO MASAHARU [JP]) | Examination | WO0060672 |