EP1422106 - Securing device for load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2008/18] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tropp, Axel Erwin Bussardstr. 15 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02102612.5 | 21.11.2002 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422106 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422106 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08, B60P1/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B60R5/04 (EP);
B60P7/0884 (EP);
B60R7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/07] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherungseinrichtung für Ladegut | [2004/22] | English: | Securing device for load | [2004/22] | French: | Dispositif de sécurisation de charge | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19514193 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19546025 (GABRIEL STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10013972 (FREIGEBER JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE10055674 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * |