EP1239573 - Overvoltage-protective device for power system, AC/DC converter and DC/DC converter constituting the power system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | [2009/04] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaya, Yoshihiro, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 02 /
Takimoto, Kyuichi, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 03 /
Matsuyama, Toshiyuki, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250073.0 | 07.01.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010059681 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001059681 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239573 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239573 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Überspannungsschutzsystem mit AC/DC und DC/DC Konvertern | [2010/01] | English: | Overvoltage-protective device for power system, AC/DC converter and DC/DC converter constituting the power system | [2002/37] | French: | Système de protection contre les surtensions comprenant des convertisseurs AC/DC et DC/DC | [2010/01] |
Former [2002/37] | Überspannungsschutzsystem mit AC/DC und DC/DC Konverters | ||
Former [2002/37] | Systeme de protection contre les surtensions comprenent des convertisseurs AC/DC et DC/DC | Examination procedure | 15.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/47] | FR | 31.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10178779 ; | [X]JPH06311739 ; | [A]DE3525942 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,13,18,19 * column 1, line 65 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0445501 (ELTEX ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,13,18,19* column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0915560 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,13,18,19 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,7-12,15-17; | [Y]EP0987806 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2,9-12,17 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US6046896 (SAEKI MITSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8,15,16 * column 5, line 35 - column 38, line 43; figures 1-12 * [A] 1,2,9-13,17 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10178779 A 19980630 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1-3,9,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06311739 A 19941104 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 18,19 * abstract * |