EP1325999 - Curtain for venetian blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nien Made Enterprise Co Ltd No. 11, Kung Chu Road, Hou Liao Village, Fang Yuan Hsian Chang Hua Hsien / TW | [2003/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nien, Ming No. 161, Lu Tung Road, Ting Ts'Uo Li, Lu Kang Chen Changhua Hsien / TW | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250077.1 | 07.01.2002 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325999 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/30, E06B9/264 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
E06B9/30 (EP);
E06B9/264 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Title | German: | Vorhang für eine Jalousie | [2003/28] | English: | Curtain for venetian blind | [2003/28] | French: | Rideau pour un store vénitien | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 03.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0654577 (HUNTER DOUGLAS INTERNATIONAL [AN]) [A] 1 * column 13, line 38 - column 14, line 5 ** figures 38-50 * |