EP1286519 - System, device, guard manager and method for intrusion management of guarded areas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allied Telesis K. K. TOC Bldg., 7-22-17, Nishi-Gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8635 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Allied Telesis K. K. TOC Bldg., 7-22-17, Nishi-Gotanda Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8635 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kazuhiko, c/o Allied Telesis Kabushiki K. TOC Bldg. 7-22-17 Nishi Gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8635 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250130.8 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010253457 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001253457 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286519 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F1/00, G07C9/00, G06K19/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
H04L41/28 (EP,US);
G07C9/22 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G07C9/29 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System, Einrichtung, Sicherheits-Manager und Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Überwachungsbereichen | [2003/09] | English: | System, device, guard manager and method for intrusion management of guarded areas | [2003/09] | French: | Système, dispositif, gestionnnaire de sécurité et procédé de gestion des atteintes à la sécurité de zones surveillées | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 27.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5905859 (HOLLOWAY MALCOLM H [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,14,17-19 * column 2, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 60 * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 67 * * column 9, line 16 - line 19 * * column 15, line 7 - column 16, line 2 * * column 16, line 6 - line 12 * * column 16, line 34 - line 48 * * column 16, line 56 - column 17, line 24; figures 1,6-8,16 * [Y] 4,5,7,8,19; | [X]WO9937055 (AMERITECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10-17 * page 2, line 13 - line 26 * * page 4, line 29 - page 8, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US5936544 (GONZALES ERIC V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-18,20-25 * column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 12; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9,22; | [X]US5940591 (BOYLE JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-18,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line 57 * * column 4, line 15 - line 64 * * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 11 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]WO0070458 (COMSEC CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11,14,17-19 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 8 * * page 6, line 8 - line 31 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2001007975 (NYBERG JAMES RONALD [US], et al) [A] 5,12,13,24* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [E]EP1249797 (ALLIED TELESIS KK [JP]) [E] 1,14,20,23,25 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *; | [XY] - SMITH J M ET AL, "Integrating physical and computer access control systems", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 1993 SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, PROCEEDINGS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS 1993 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 13-15 OCT. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941012), ISBN 0-7803-1479-4, pages 176 - 179, XP010146508 [X] 1-3,6,10-18,20,21,23-25 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,7-9,19,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1994.363771 | [A] - BEHRIN E, "Security upgrades at the Lawrence Livermore National Laboratory", IEEE, LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL LABORATORY, XP010078124 [A] 1-25 * page 122, column L, line 1 - page 123, column R, line L * |