EP1226818 - Pharmaceutical dosage forms with enhanced cohesive and compressibility properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vendola, Thomas Anthony Pfizer Global Res. & Developt., Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250201.7 | 11.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | US20010264378P | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 264378 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226818 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/16, A61K9/20 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K9/1611 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Arzneiform mit verbesserten kohäsiven und kompressiven Eigenschaften | [2002/31] | English: | Pharmaceutical dosage forms with enhanced cohesive and compressibility properties | [2002/31] | French: | Formulation pharmaceutique présentant des propriétés de cohesion et de compressibilité améliorées | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9313758 (PFIZER [US]) [DY] 1-15 * claims 1-9 *; | [DY]US5853758 (LO JULIAN BELKNAP [US]) [DY] 1-15 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 38; example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0914818 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 22 - page 5, paragraph 33; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]US5958455 (ROSER BRUCE J [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 60; example 2 *; | [X]EP0960621 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, column 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 19; examples 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [PX]WO0189485 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-15* page 4, lines 5-30; examples 1,2; claims 1,8,10,11 * |