EP1330078 - Spanning tree method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Foreest, Nicky Molensteeg 14 7551 DB Hengelo, Twente / NL | 02 /
Malhotra, Richa De Klomp 75-16 7511 DG Enschede.Twente. / NL | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250295.9 | 16.01.2002 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330078 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L29/14 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L12/462 (EP,US);
H04L45/48 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/16] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Méthode d'arbre complet | [2003/30] | English: | Spanning tree method | [2003/30] | French: | Verfahren mit vollständigem Baum | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 24.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, SE | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/52] | 17.08.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6330229 (JAIN VIPIN K [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 41 * * column 8, line 12 - line 22 *[A] 2,4 |