EP1225125 - Outboard marine drive including an engine lower cowling made of plastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/30] | Outboard marine drive including an engine lower cowling made of plastic material | ||
[2004/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshigasaki, Tsuyoshi, c/o KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ide, Shinichi, c/o KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Rinzaki, Shoichi, c/o KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250335.3 | 18.01.2002 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | JP20010011836 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001011836 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225125 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225125 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225125 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/00, B63H20/32, F02B61/04 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
B63H20/00 (EP);
B63H20/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | B63H20/00, B63H20/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aussenbordantriebseinheit mit einem Triebwerksuntergehäuse aus Kunststoff | [2002/30] | English: | Outboard marine drive including an engine lower cowling made of plastic material | [2004/03] | French: | Unité d'entraînement hors-bord comprenant un capot inférieur du moteur en matière plastique | [2002/30] |
Former [2002/30] | Outboard marine drive including an engine lower cowling made of plastic material | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 10.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4952180 (WATANABE EIFU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A]US4955836 (SUZUKI TOMONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 49 *; | [A]US5069643 (WESTBERG TOM [US], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract *; | [AD]US5263884 (OISHI HIROSHI [JP]) [AD] 8-10* abstract * | by applicant | JPS5954400 | JPH0585484 | JPH10175595 |