EP1225302 - Well completion apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Echols, Ralph Harvey 4256 Millview Lane Dallas, Texas 75287 / US | 02 /
Thomas, Phillip T. 1930 Maxwell Drive Lewisville, Texas 75067 / US | 03 /
Hailey, Travis T., Jr. 3902 Lyndhurst Place Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250381.7 | 21.01.2002 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | US20010767975 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: US 767975 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225302 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225302 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/04, E21B43/26, E21B43/14 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
E21B43/14 (EP,US);
E21B43/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | E21B43/04, E21B43/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/46] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Komplettierung einer Bohrung | [2002/30] | English: | Well completion apparatus and method | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de complétion de puits | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/09] | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4105069 (BAKER EUGENE E) [Y] 6-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5829525 (DOBSON RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 8,9 *; | [Y]US6065535 (ROSS COLBY M [US]) [Y] 6-10 * abstract * |