EP1291853 - Position demodulating method and circuit of disk apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takaishi, Kazuhiko, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Hara, Takeyori, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Okamura, Eiji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250402.1 | 21.01.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010269871 | 06.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001269871 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291853 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291853 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1291853 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55, G11B21/02, G11B5/596 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G11B5/5526 (EP,US);
G11B5/596 (KR);
G11B21/106 (EP,US);
G11B5/59622 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G11B5/55, G11B21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/50] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zur Demodulation der Position für ein Plattenlaufwerk | [2003/11] | English: | Position demodulating method and circuit of disk apparatus | [2003/11] | French: | Méthode et circuit pour démoduler la position pour un disque dur | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5381281 (SHRINKLE LOUIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 8, line 17 - column 16, line 32 *; | [A]US5576910 (ROMANO PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 9-15* column 5, line 43 - column 15, line 60 *; | [A]US5726823 (KISAKA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 7, line 17 - column 12, line 45 *; | [XA]US6034835 (SERRANO LOUIS JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1 * column 11, line 8 - column 13, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 9; | [XA]US6078445 (SERRANO LOUIS JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * column 9, line 56 - column 12, line 58; figure 10 * * column 13, line 17 - column 14, line 29 * [A] 16,8; | [XA]US6172839 (AHN YOUNG-SHUN [KR]) [X] 9 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 44 * [A] 1 |