EP1232766 - Method and apparatus for safety catheter insertion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medex, Inc. 2231 Rutherford Road Carlsbad California 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Medex, Inc. 2231 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boudreaux, Chad P. 10840 Lakehurst Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / GB | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251036.6 | 15.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | US20010788073 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: US 788073 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1232766 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1232766 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M5/32 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61M25/0643 (EP,US);
A61M25/0618 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | A61M25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Einführen eines Sicherheitskatheters | [2002/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for safety catheter insertion device | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'insertion d'un cathéter de sécurité | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 25.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3352306 (SIDNEY HRISCH) [A] 2-9 * page 2, line 63 - line 65; figures 15,18,19 *; | [A]EP0645159 (CRITIKON INC [US]) [A] 7-9* page 5, line 26 - line 32 *; | [X]US5601536 (CRAWFORD MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 6,9 * | by applicant | US5573510 | US5957892 | US6050976 |