EP1248174 - Voltage generator circuit and method for controlling thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hajime, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Syuichi, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 03 /
Iwase, Akihiro, c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251264.4 | 25.02.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | JP20010107131 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001107131 | JP20010182982 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001182982 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248174 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248174 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248174 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
G05F1/46 (EP,US);
G11C5/14 (KR);
G05F1/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/50] |
Former [2005/26] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spannungsgeneratorschaltung und zugehöriges Steuerverfahren | [2002/41] | English: | Voltage generator circuit and method for controlling thereof | [2002/41] | French: | Circuit générateur de tension et procédé de commande d'un tel dispositif | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07118061.6 / EP1884855 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0454170 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [X]EP0613071 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,13-16,30-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5408172 (TANIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32* column A *; | [A]US5506495 (UCHIDA TOSHIYA [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5675280 (NOMURA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [X]US5696465 (ISHIZUKA NOBUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,6,13-16,30-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5757226 (YAMADA TOYONOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5903513 (ITOU TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5986293 (SUZUKI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5990671 (NAGATA KYOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5994886 (SHINOZAKI NAOHARU [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US6064188 (TAKASHIMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US6111395 (HIRADE TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A * | Examination | US5811861 |