EP1248237 - Method for measuring volumetric changes in portions of a human body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | [2006/22] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallo, Warren 67 Ketcham Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
Kollias, Nikiforos 406 Sunset Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251816.1 | 14.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010275733P | 14.03.2001 Original published format: US 275733 P | US20010306776P | 20.07.2001 Original published format: US 306776 P | US20020077997 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: US 77997 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248237 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248237 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248237 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G06T17/40 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/442 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
G06T17/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/04] | G06T7/20 | ||
Former IPC [2002/41] | G06T17/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen volumetrischer Veränderungen an menschlichen Körperteilen | [2002/41] | English: | Method for measuring volumetric changes in portions of a human body | [2002/41] | French: | Procédé de mésure des changements volumetriques des portions du corps humain | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Request for further processing for: | 29.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2005 | Decision despatched | 10.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CY | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5482048 (JOHNSON PETER C [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, line 18 - line 46 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 16 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 27 * * column 13, line 26 - line 35 *; | [Y]US5687259 (LINFORD RAY A [US]) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 17 - line 19 * * column 5, line 5 - line 22 * * column 6, line 12 - line 21 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 12 * * column 16, line 12 - line 17 * * claim 11 *; | [A]US5852672 (LU SHIN-YEE [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - line 57 * * column 2, line 4 - line 8 * * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * * column 3, line 20 - line 27 * * column 3, line 58 - line 60 ** claim 1 *; | [Y] - S. JASPERS, H. HOPERMANN, G. SAUERMANN, U. HOPPE, R. LUNDERSTÄDT AND J. ENNEN, "Rapid in vivo measurement of the topography of human skin by active image triangulation using a digital micromirror device", SKIN RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 5, pages 195 - 207, XP001119021 [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * introduction * * section "Material and Methods", p. 196, left col., l. 23 - p. 198, left col., l. 4* * section "Extension of skin", p. 202, right col., l. 39 - p. 203, left col., l. 3* * section "Discussion", p. 203, left col., l. 4 - 8* |