EP1313141 - Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sashida, Naoya, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/20] |
Former [2003/21] | 01 /
Sashida, Naoya, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/20] |
Former [2003/21] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251817.9 | 14.03.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | JP20010350323 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001350323 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1313141 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1313141 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313141 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8246, H01L21/768 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
H01L21/7687 (EP,US);
H01L27/105 (KR);
H01L21/76877 (EP,US);
H10B53/00 (EP,US);
H10B53/30 (EP,US);
H01L28/55 (EP,US);
H01L28/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | H01L21/8246, H01L27/115 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/04] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2003/21] | English: | Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same | [2003/21] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2013 | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.05.2014 | [2015/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0642167 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]); | [X]US5716875 (JONES JR ROBERT E [US], et al); | [XA]GB2338595 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XA]DE10001118 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) | Examination | US6313491 |