EP1345298 - Wavelength monitoring apparatus and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harker, Andrew 8 Camberley Road Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 5QF / GB | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Coker, David Graeme Agilent Technologies UK Ltd Legal Dept Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Coker, David Graeme Agilent Technologies UK Ltd. Legal Department Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle Wokingham Berkshire RG41 5DZ / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | Coker, David Graeme Agilent Technologies UK Ltd, Legal Department, M/S CSC1GM2, Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251899.7 | 16.03.2002 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345298 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/0687, H01S5/022 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H01S5/0687 (EP,US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/02325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/24] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wellenlängenkontrollgerät und Verfahren dafür | [2003/38] | English: | Wavelength monitoring apparatus and method therefor | [2003/38] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de longueur d'onde et méthode associée | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 27.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9843327 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 18 - page 19; figures 9,10 *; | [X]EP0967698 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 8,9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2001036206 (JERMAN JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * paragraph [0106]; figure 14 *; | [A]EP1158631 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * |