EP1244215 - Phase lock loop gain control using unit current sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gomez, Ramon A. 25802 Paseo de la Paz San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252014.2 | 20.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | US20010811611 | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 811611 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244215 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244215 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/00 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H03L7/00 (EP,US);
H03B5/1212 (EP,US);
H03B5/1215 (EP,US);
H03B5/1228 (EP,US);
H03B5/1243 (EP,US);
H03B5/1253 (EP,US);
H03B5/1265 (EP,US);
H03B5/1278 (EP,US);
H03D7/165 (EP,US);
H03D7/18 (EP,US);
H03J5/244 (EP,US);
H03L7/0898 (EP,US);
H03L7/093 (EP,US);
H03L7/099 (EP,US);
H03L7/1072 (EP,US);
H03L7/18 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0046 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0048 (EP,US);
H03B2200/005 (EP,US);
H03B2201/02 (EP,US);
H03B2201/0208 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Phasenregelschleifeverstärkungssteuerung mit Einheitsstromquellen | [2002/39] | English: | Phase lock loop gain control using unit current sources | [2002/39] | French: | Commande d'amplification de boucle à verouillage de phase avec sources de courant unitaires | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05013611.8 / EP1592135 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Request for further processing for: | 27.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2007 | BE | 23.05.2007 | CH | 23.05.2007 | CY | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | IT | 23.05.2007 | LI | 23.05.2007 | NL | 23.05.2007 | TR | 23.05.2007 | SE | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | ES | 03.09.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 03.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0627820 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 2, line 49 - column 8, line 58; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0642227 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-32 * page 4, line 42 - page 5, line 38; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5485125 (DUFOUR YVES R [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5625325 (ROTZOLL ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 10; figures 7,9 *; | [A]EP1075086 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-32* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 57; figures 1,2 * |