EP1248016 - Inwardly cambered rocker joint for a power transmission chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200 Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skurka, John Charles 18 Lounsbery Road Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US | 02 /
Manning, Steven Harold 4 Ceurter Road Berkshire, NY 13736 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252382.3 | 02.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010825527 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: US 825527 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248016 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248016 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/04 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
F16G13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/49] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kippbolzen mit innerer Krümmung für Triebkette | [2002/41] | English: | Inwardly cambered rocker joint for a power transmission chain | [2002/41] | French: | Pivot à basculement à cintrage intérieur pour chaîne de transmission | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GB, SE | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3213699 (TEREPIN RAYMOND H) [A] 5,6,9 * column 2, line 62 - line 70 * * column 3, line 18 - line 24 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB1132388 (MORSE CHAIN CO) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 62 - line 97 * * page 3, line 21 - line 26 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US4010656 (JEFFREY JOSEPH O) [A] 9* column 3, line 53 - line 57; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2067243 | US2324640 | US4758210 | US4764158 | US4911682 | US5419743 | US5453059 | US5588926 |