EP1298829 - HARQ techniques for multiple antenna systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudrapatna, Ashok N. 34 Knollcroft Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey, 07920 / US | 02 /
Sharma, Naresh 70-J. Village Green Budd Lake, New Jersey, 07828 / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2003/14] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252543.0 | 10.04.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | US20010967009 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 967009 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298829 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04L1/18 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H04L1/1816 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04L1/0625 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,US);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04L1/188 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HARQ verfahren für eine Mehrantennenanordnung | [2003/14] | English: | HARQ techniques for multiple antenna systems | [2003/14] | French: | HARQ techniques de pour système à plusieurs antennes | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/35] | 10.07.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/35] | Appeal following examination | 04.04.2005 | Appeal received No. T0620/05 | 03.05.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.06.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0736979 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - line 26 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 4 * * claims 1,4-7,9,11 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4,7-10; | [A]US5657325 (LOU HUI LING [US], et al) [A] 3,4,7-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 65 ** claim 1 *; | [A]WO0137433 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 3,4,7-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - line 20 *; | [PX]EP1172959 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * claims 1,2 * | Examination | US6144711 | - 3GPP TR 25.848 V4.0.0 (2001-02), 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical layer aspects of UTRA High Speed Downlink Packet Access (Release 4) | - COSTELLO D.J. ET AL, "Applications of Error-Control Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (199810), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 2531 - 2560 |