EP1249859 - Substrate processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Natsuhara, Masuhiro, Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Nakata, Hirohiko, Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Kuibira, Akira, Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Shinma, Kenji, Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252564.6 | 10.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010112902 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001112902 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249859 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249859 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, C23C16/458, H01L21/68 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/67103 (EP,US);
H01L21/30 (KR);
C23C16/4581 (EP,US);
C23C16/4586 (EP,US);
H01L21/68714 (EP,US);
Y10T279/23 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/04] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Substratverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2002/42] | English: | Substrate processing apparatus | [2002/42] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de substrats | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03261131 ; | [DX]EP0447155 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-18 * abstract ** the whole document *; | [X]EP0506391 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 5 - page 7; example 1 * * page 20 - page 21; example 15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 067, Database accession no. (E - 1168), & JP03261131 A 19911121 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-18 * abstract * |