EP1249734 - Rectangle/lattice data conversion method for charged particle beam exposure mask pattern and charged particle beam exposure method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | ||
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogino, Kozo, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Osawa, Morimi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
Ogino, Kozo, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Osawa, Morimi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2002/42] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252579.4 | 10.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010153233 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001153233 | JP20010112787 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001112787 | JP20010333361 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001333361 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249734 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249734 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249734 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/302, G03F7/20 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/3026 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31769 (EP,US);
Y10S430/143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/43] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umwandlung von Rechteckdaten in Gitterdaten für ein Muster einer Belichtungsmaske für geladene Teilchen und Belichtungsmethode für geladene Teilchen | [2011/43] | English: | Rectangle/lattice data conversion method for charged particle beam exposure mask pattern and charged particle beam exposure method | [2002/42] | French: | Procédé de conversion de données rectangulaires en données de réseau pour un motif de masque d'exposition par particules chargées et méthode d'exposition par particules chargées | [2011/43] |
Former [2002/42] | Verfahren zur Umwandlung von Rechteckdaten in Gitterdaten für eine Belichtungsmaske für geladene Teilchen und Belichtungsmethode für geladene Teilchen | ||
Former [2002/42] | Procédé pour la conversion de dates rectangulaires en dates de réseau pour une masque d exposition pour des particules chargées et méthode d exposition pour des particules chargées | Examination procedure | 16.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6110627 (NAKASUJI MAMORU [JP]) [A] 1-23,26-47 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19939687 (LEICA MICROSYS LITHOGRAPHY LTD [DE]) [A] 1-23,26-47 * the whole document *; | [DA]JP2001052999 (FUJITSU LTD) [DA] 1-23,26-47 * the whole document *; | [PA]JP2001326165 (NIKON CORP) [PA] 1-23,26-47 * the whole document *; | [E]US6610989 (TAKAHASHI KIMITOSHI [US]) [E] 1-23,26-47* the whole document * |