EP1251008 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozaki, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/43] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252589.3 | 11.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010119835 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001119835 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251008 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251008 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251008 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00, B41J13/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G03G15/6573 (EP,US);
G03G15/00 (KR);
B41J11/0025 (EP,US);
B41J11/003 (EP,US);
B41J13/0054 (EP,US);
G03G15/6529 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00561 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/23] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2002/43] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2002/43] | French: | Dispositif de formation d'image | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP08011098.4 / EP1980406 | EP08163953.6 / EP2014476 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10119364 ; | [Y]JPH11348371 ; | [Y]JP2000015882 ; | [Y]US5816716 (SUGIYAMA NORIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 8-10,21-23,28,31 * column 6, line 32 - column 9, line 55; figures 13,14 *; | [A]US5828818 (ANZAI KATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5835820 (MARTIN ANDREW T [US], et al) [A] 8-10* column W *; | [Y]US6024505 (SHINOHARA HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 2-4,7,15-17,20,30,32 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 67 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10119364 A 19980512 (CANON INC) [X] 1,11,14,24,27,29 * abstract * [Y] 2-7,15-20,30,32 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11348371 A 19991221 (CANON INC) [Y] 5,6,18,19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000015882 A 20000118 (CANON INC) [Y] 8-10,21-23,28,31 * abstract * |