EP1251136 - Method and reagents for analyzing the nucleotide sequence of nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sampson, Jeffrey R. 1228 Drake Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
Myerson, Joel 1320 Hopkins Street Berkeley, California 94702 / US | 03 /
Tsalenko, Anna M. 5858 S. Kenwood, No.1 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 04 /
Sampas, Nicholas M. 1418 Cherry Avenue San Jose, CA 95126 / US | 05 /
Webb, Peter G. 345 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 06 /
Yakhini, Zohar H. 3 Simtat Hashazif Zikhron Ya'acov 30900 / IL | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/43] | 01 /
Sampson, Jeffrey R. 1228 Drake Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | ||
02 /
Myerson, Joel 1320 Hopkins Street Berkeley, California 94702 / US | |||
03 /
Tsalenko, Anna M. 5858 S. Kenwood, No.1 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | |||
04 /
Sampas, Nicholas M. 1418 Cherry Avenue San Jose, CA 95126 / US | |||
05 /
Webb, Peter G. 345 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
06 /
Yakhini, Zohar H. Zikhron Ya'Acov 30900 / IL | Representative(s) | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell 44 Prespect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 4 St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252723.8 | 17.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | US20010836012 | 17.04.2001 Original published format: US 836012 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251136 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251136 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251136 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C12Q1/68 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6872 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00452 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00454 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00497 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00581 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00599 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0061 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00641 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00707 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2533/101 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2533/107 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Reagenzien zur Analyse der Nukleotidsequenz von Nukleinsäuren | [2002/43] | English: | Method and reagents for analyzing the nucleotide sequence of nucleic acids | [2002/43] | French: | Méthode et réactifs pour l'analyse de séquences d'acides nucléiques | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Request for further processing for: | 24.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0778280 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [X] 1-7,9-11,14,19-21,24 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 56 * * page 7, line 13 - line 36 * [Y] 12,13,15-18,22,23,25-30; | [A]WO9810095 (BRAX GENOMICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] * page 15, line 10 - page 18, line 34 *; | [XY]WO9831830 (BRAX GENOMICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14,19-21,24 * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 35 * * page 33, lines 7-35 * * page 22, line 15 - line 27 * [Y] 12,13,15-18,22,23,25-30; | [Y]WO9831836 (HYSEQ INC [US]) [Y] 1-7,9-30 * page 111, line 1 - line 20 * * example 18 * * example 30; claims 32,33 *; | [Y]WO9932501 (BRAX GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-30 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0003038 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-7,9-30 * the whole document *; | [A] - DRMANAC R ET AL, "SEQUENCING OF MEGABASE PLUS DNA BY HYBRIDIZATION: THEORY OF THE METHOD", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (1989), vol. 4, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 114 - 128, XP000195550 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0888-7543(89)90290-5 | [A] - MIRZABEKOV A D, "DNA SEQUENCING BY HYBRIDIZATION -A MEGASEQUENCING METHOD AND A DIAGNOSTIC TOOL?", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, GB, (1994), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 27 - 32, XP000670232 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(94)90008-6 |