EP1251054 - Collision energy absorbing structure of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2007/33] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Makaoto 5-37-2210 Shirogayama 3-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0884 / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252737.8 | 18.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010122028 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001122028 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251054 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251054 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251054 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61D15/06, B62D21/15, B60R19/34 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
F16F7/12 (EP,US);
B60R19/34 (EP,US);
B61D15/06 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Aufprallenergie verzehrende Struktur für ein Fahrzeug | [2002/43] | English: | Collision energy absorbing structure of vehicle | [2002/43] | French: | Structure absorbeur d'énergie de collision pour un véhicule | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | GB | 18.04.2008 | IE | 18.04.2008 | LU | 18.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 18.04.2008 | ||
IE | 18.04.2008 | ||
LU | 18.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 18.04.2008 | ||
IE | 18.04.2008 | ||
LU | 18.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 18.04.2008 | ||
IE | 18.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 18.04.2008 | ||
IE | 18.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5431445 (WHEATLEY DONALD G [US]) [A] 1,3-6,8-11 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5579699 (DANNAWI MARWAN [FR], et al) [A] 4,8 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 52 ** column 9, line 27 - line 55; figures 8,11,14,15 *; | [A]DE19631901 (REYNOLDS ALUMINIUM BV [NL]) [A] 1,3-6,8-11 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]GB2304651 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,11 * page 7, line 20 - page 12, line 2; figures 2-5 * [A] 4-6,8-10; | [A]US6167815 (WERNER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 5-7,9,10 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH02650527B | JPH02882243B | JPH0115564 | JPH09277953 | JPH09277954 |