EP1251034 - Detaching mechanism and information recording and reproducing apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ido, Kenjiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishi-machi, Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Watabe, Shoji, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishi-machi, Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252739.4 | 18.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010123179 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001123179 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251034 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251034 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251034 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/08 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H04B1/3822 (EP);
B60R11/02 (US);
E05D1/00 (US);
G11B33/02 (US);
H04B1/08 (US);
H05K5/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2002/43] | B60R11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lösemechanismus und dessen Verwendung in einem Datenaufzeichnungs- Wiedergabegerät | [2002/43] | English: | Detaching mechanism and information recording and reproducing apparatus using the same | [2002/43] | French: | Mécanisme de détachement et appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction utilisant celui-ci | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.01.2007 | 29.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4940414 (LEE JONG D [KR]); | [X]US5097392 (TANAKA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0507987 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5449228 (YOSHIDA TOMOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [A]US5852594 (KAISE KAZUHITO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0957003 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) |