EP1256703 - Turbocharger with wastegate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLSET ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED St. Andrews Road Huddersfield, HD1 6RA / GB | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEwen, James c/o Holset Engineering Co. Ltd., St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6RA / GB | 02 /
Day, Andrew c/o Holset Engineering Co. Ltd., St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6RA / GB | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252802.0 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | GB20010011681 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: GB 0111681 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256703 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256703 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256703 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/18, F02B39/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F02B37/025 (EP,US);
F02B37/12 (KR);
F02B37/186 (EP,US);
F02B39/00 (EP,US);
F15B15/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/51] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Turbolader mit Abblasventil | [2002/46] | English: | Turbocharger with wastegate | [2002/46] | French: | Turbocompresseur comprenant une soupape de décharge | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3904172 (BAUMANN HANS D) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 45 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [X]US4656834 (ELPERN DAVID G [US]) [X] 1-4,12-16* column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 21; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0523859 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-16,18,19 * column 3, line 27 - line 49; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0976919 |