EP1253619 - Charged particle beam exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muraki, Masato Canon K.K., 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sohda, Yasunari, Hitachi, Ltd., I.P.G New Marunouchi Bldg., 1-5-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Shinichi Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/41] |
Former [2002/44] | 01 /
Muraki, Masato Canon K.K., 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Sohda, Yasunari, Hitachi, Ltd., I.P.G New Marumouchi Bldg., 1-5-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Hashimoto, Shinichi Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252818.6 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | JP20010124758 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124758 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253619 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1253619 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253619 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/04, H01J37/317 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
H01J37/3177 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H01J37/045 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0437 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31774 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2008/30] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ladungsträgerteilchenstrahl-Belichtungsgerät und dessen Anwendungverfahren zur Herstellung von Vorrichtungen | [2002/44] | English: | Charged particle beam exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method using same | [2002/44] | French: | Appareil d'exposition à faisceau de particules chargées et procédé pour son utilisation dans la fabrication de dispositifs | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.04.2010 | [2011/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5973332 (MURAKI MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 52 * * column 9, lines 19-57 *[Y] 3,4; | [XY]US6104035 (MURAKI MASATO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * figures 1,3a,3b,4a,5,23 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 19 * * column 5, lines 35-59 * * column 6, lines 29-67 * * column 7, lines 8-59 * * column 21, lines 46-65 * [Y] 3,4 | by applicant | US5973332 | US6104035 |