EP1255216 - A system and method for managing a product strategy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansson, Stefan Arsenalgatan 6a 411 20 G-teborg / SE | 02 /
Mendis, Kolita 311, Grant Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
Loczi, Geza 51, Majestic Court No. 205 Moorpark, California 93021 / US | 04 /
Ippoliti, Michael 208, Pomana Avenue Long Beach, California 90803 / US | 05 /
Johnson, Tisha 336, Sonora Avenue No. A Glendale, California 91201 / US | 06 /
Sommerfeld, Benny 3173, Clarita Court Thousand Oaks, California 91362 / US | 07 /
Taylor, Blair 3639, Lang Ranch Parkway Thousand Oaks, California 91362 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252874.9 | 24.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | US20010681597 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 681597 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255216 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Verwalten einer Produkt-Stategie | [2002/45] | English: | A system and method for managing a product strategy | [2002/45] | French: | Système et méthode pour la gestion d'une stratégie d'un produit | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 14.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/51] | 25.07.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |