EP1361337 - Turbine airfoil cooling configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starkweather, John Howard 5945 Sovereign Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253252.7 | 09.05.2002 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361337 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361337 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kühlkonfiguration für ein Turbomaschinenschaufelblatt | [2003/46] | English: | Turbine airfoil cooling configuration | [2003/46] | French: | Configuration de refroidissement pour une aube de turbomachine | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.2007
14.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.2007
14.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2007/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.2007
Alstom Technology Ltd. Brown Boveri Str. 7/699/5 5401-Baden / CH Opponent's representative Dimper, Dieter, et al, et al ALSTOM Technologie Ltd, CHTI Intellectual Property, Brown Boveri Strasse 7/699/5 5401 Baden / CH | 12.10.2007 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.12.2007 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.01.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/07] | Appeal following opposition | 14.05.2010 | Appeal received No. T1056/10 | 23.07.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60198305 ; | [Y]US3533711 (KERCHER DAVID M) [Y] 1-10 * figure 4 *; | [A]US4278400 (YAMARIK GEORGE J, et al) [A] 1-10 * column A * * column 2, line 54 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2250548 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [X]US5975850 (ABUAF NESIM NMN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 14 - line 56; figure 2 *; | [E]US2002119045 (STARKWEATHER JOHN HOWARD [US]) [E] 1-10* figures 1-3; claims 1-28 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860225), vol. 010, no. 047, Database accession no. (M - 456), & JP60198305 A 19851007 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN;OTHERS: 0J) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |