EP1257085 - Apparatus and method for fee charging, and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odagawa, Satoshi, c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Shioda, Takehiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253307.9 | 10.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010141899 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001141899 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1257085 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1257085 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00, G06F17/60, A63F13/12 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H04M15/8214 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0273 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1471 (EP,US);
H04M2215/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | H04L12/14, H04M15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/32] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gebührenberechnungs vorrichtung und verfahren, und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium | [2002/46] | English: | Apparatus and method for fee charging, and information recording medium | [2002/46] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de facturation de taxes, et support d'enregistrement de données | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP2002189952 ; | [A]US5819092 (FERGUSON CHARLES H [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 4, line 28 - line L * * column 31, line 1 - column 32, line 14 ** column 29, line 34 - column 30, line L *; | [X]EP0905961 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,19,22,23 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] *; | [E]WO02071287 (MOBILITEC INC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,9,11,12,19,22,23 * claims 1-29 *; | [E]GB2373885 (WORLD INFORMATION ON NET [GB]) [E] 1,11,22,23 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 35 * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002189952 A 20020705 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [E] 1,2,9,11,12,19,22,23 * abstract * |