EP1258300 - Hemming machine with dual ball screw drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALIANT CORPORATION 9355 Anchor Drive Windsor Ontario N8N 5A8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states VALIANT CORPORATION 9355 Anchor Drive Windsor, Ontario N8N 5A8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denis, Keith Saint 2164 Dimu Drive, R.R. No 2 Tecumseh, Ontario N8N 2M1 / CA | 02 /
Cote, Ray 1267 Fairview Windsor, Ontario N8N 2M1 / CA | 03 /
Raffin, Louis 1466 Hansen Crescent Windsor, Ontario N8W 5P8 / CA | 04 /
Harrison, Lee 10147 Aspen Lane Windsor, Ontario N8R 2B7 / CA | [2006/06] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
Denis, Keith Saint 2164 Dimu Drive, R.R. No 2 Tecumseh, Ontario N8N 2M1 / CA | ||
02 /
Cote, Ray 1267 Fairview Windsor, Ontario N8N 2M1 / CA | |||
03 /
Raffin, Louis 1466 Hansen Crescent Windsor, Ontario N8W 6P8 / CA | |||
04 /
Harrison, Lee 10147 Aspen Lane Windsor, Ontario N8R 2B7 / CA | Representative(s) | Shelley, Mark Raymond, et al Bryer, Shelley, John Amor, Greenwood LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Shelley, Mark Raymond, et al K R Bryer & Co., 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253402.8 | 15.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | US20010861067 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: US 861067 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258300 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258300 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B21D39/021 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | RO | 05.03.2004 | Title | German: | Bördelvorrichtung mit Doppelantriebkugelgewindespindel | [2002/47] | English: | Hemming machine with dual ball screw drive | [2002/47] | French: | Machine de rabattage avec vis d'entrainement à bille à double trajet | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5454261 (CAMPIAN JON R [US]); | [X]US6182492 (RAFFIN LOUIS [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,17 * the whole document * |