EP1262481 - Indanone derivatives for use as fragrances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levorse, Anthony 71 Washington Ave, So. Amboy Middlesex County, New Jersey 08879 / US | 02 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Bld Hazlet Monmouth County, New Jersey 07730 / US | 03 /
Arruda, Edward Mark 60 Country Road, D22, Cliffwood Monmouth County, New Jersey 07721 / US | 04 /
Beck, Charles E.J. 10 Beekman Road Summit, Union County, New Jersey 07901 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253426.7 | 16.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | US20010859953 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: US 859953 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262481 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262481 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/77, C07C49/115 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C07D307/92 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/477 (EP,US);
C07C49/653 (EP,US);
C07D307/93 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/68, C07C49/477 (US,EP);
C07C45/68, C07C49/653 (EP,US);
C07C45/71, C07C49/653 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Indanon-Derivate als Duftstoffe | [2002/49] | English: | Indanone derivatives for use as fragrances | [2002/49] | French: | Dérivés des indanones comme parfums | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3847993 (HALL J, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 34 - line 41; example 1 *; | [A]EP0395199 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [A] 1-11* page 33; example V *; | [A]EP0825166 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 2 * |