|
14.11.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
39 |
|
17.02.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |