EP1261132 - Contactless switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenElevator Capital Corp. 15141 East Whittier Boulevard Whittier California 90603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states ThyssenElevator Capital Corp. 15141 East Whittier Boulevard Whittier, California 90603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sweet, Robert H. 9500 Harrit Road No. 234 Lakeside, California 92040 / US | 02 /
Palazzola, Michael A. 4157 Avati Drive San Diego, California 92117 / US | 03 /
Nickerson, James A. PO Box 1725 Spring Valley, California 91979 / US | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
Sweet, Robert H. 9500 Harrit Road No. 234 Lakeside, California 92040 / US | ||
02 /
Palazzola, Michael A. 4157 Avati Drive San Diego, California 92117 / US | |||
03 /
Nickerson, James A. 10632 Len Street Santee, California 92071 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253640.3 | 23.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | US20010865269 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 865269 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261132 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1261132 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/97 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H03K17/97 (EP,US);
H03K17/9502 (EP,US);
H03K2017/9713 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94094 (EP,US);
H03K2217/9653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Kontaktlose Schaltervorrichtung | [2002/48] | English: | Contactless switching device | [2002/48] | French: | Dispositif de commutation sans contact | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Request for further processing for: | 19.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | 26.04.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   28.04.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   09.05.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4303856 (SERRAS-PAULET EDOUARD) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 16 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 53 * * figures 8-11 *; | [A]DE4006596 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] * column 2, line 42 - column 2, line 45 ** figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0621735 (SCHAEPER AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * column 3, line 42 - column 6, line 21 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0681369 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A] - PROAKIS J G, "Digital Communications, PASSAGE", DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING. COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : MCGRAW-HILL, US, (1995), ISBN 0-07-113814-5, pages 39 - 41,58, XP002289026 [A] * page 58, paragraph 1 - page 59, paragraph 1 * |